NJ S2796 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3833
Note: Carry Over of previous S2592
Note: Carry Over of previous S2592
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases amounts of property tax deductions for senior citizens and persons with disabilities, and veterans, from $250 to $500.
Title
Increases amounts of property tax deductions for senior citizens and persons with disabilities, and veterans, from $250 to $500.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2871 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
A3833 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2592 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3833 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2592 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2796 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2796_I1.HTM |