NJ S2795 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides Commissioner of Human Services and certain insurers access to Prescription Monitoring Program.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides Commissioner of Human Services and certain insurers access to Prescription Monitoring Program.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2017-06-26SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2017-05-25SenateSenate Amendment (29-0) (Diegnan
2017-01-30SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-11-21SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4440 (Same As) 2017-01-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback