NJ S2785 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5146

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A591 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits discrimination against cash-paying consumers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits discrimination against cash-paying consumers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateSubstituted by A591 (3R)
2018-12-17SenateSenate Amendment (31-0) (Pou)
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A591 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.50.
A5146 (Carry Over) 2017-08-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback