NJ S2784 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.170.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.170.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides partial exemption and maximum sales and use tax imposition amount for sales and uses of boats and vessels; establishes grace period for use tax imposition on certain boats and vessels used by resident purchasers.*
Title
Provides partial exemption and maximum sales and use tax imposition amount for sales and uses of boats and vessels; establishes grace period for use tax imposition on certain boats and vessels used by resident purchasers.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3856 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3856 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3856 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3856 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.170. |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (64-0-0) |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-1) |
2015-09-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (33-1) |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-4-4) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (44-29-0) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Fiocchi) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A3856 (1R) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to enact |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3856 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by S2784 (1R)