NJ S2773 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.48.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies definition of health care service firms and homemaker-home health aides.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies definition of health care service firms and homemaker-home health aides.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4043 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.48.
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
2019-01-31AssemblySubstituted for A4043
2018-11-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-10-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-21SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4043 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2773

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback