NJ S2771 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4579
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Rural Business Development Program" in EDA; appropriates $35 million to EDA from federal funds.
Title
Establishes "Rural Business Development Program" in EDA; appropriates $35 million to EDA from federal funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2771 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A5356 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A5356 (Same As) 2021-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee