NJ S2766 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Substituted by A4151 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Substituted by A4151 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain restrictions on cannabis establishments' owners; expands scope of review of cannabis establishment license applications and related materials.
Title
Revises certain restrictions on cannabis establishments' owners; expands scope of review of cannabis establishment license applications and related materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A4151 (1R) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4151 (Same As) 2023-09-25 - Approved P.L.2023, c.162.