NJ S2763 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S796
Note: Carry Over of previous A1520
Note: Carry Over of previous A1520
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases age of dependent for whom gross income tax exemption for higher education expenses may be claimed from under 22 years to under 27 years.
Title
Increases age of dependent for whom gross income tax exemption for higher education expenses may be claimed from under 22 years to under 27 years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A202 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S796 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1520 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S796 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1520 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee