NJ S2759 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A4249 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands per adjusted admission charge on hospitals to create supplemental funding pool for State's graduate medical education subsidy; appropriates $24,285,714.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands per adjusted admission charge on hospitals to create supplemental funding pool for State's graduate medical education subsidy; appropriates $24,285,714.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted by A4249 (1R)
2018-06-21SenateSenate Amendment (23-0) (Ruiz)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-18SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4249 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.116.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback