NJ S2743 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A4127 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Mandates access to periodic cancer screening examinations for professional firefighters not enrolled in SHBP; makes appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandates access to periodic cancer screening examinations for professional firefighters not enrolled in SHBP; makes appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-29SenateSubstituted by A4127 (1R)
2022-06-27SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-06-20SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2022-06-02SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4127 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Approved P.L.2022, c.109.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback