NJ S2729 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A4091 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A4091 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes County Option Hospital Fee Pilot Program permanent and expands definition of "participating county" under program.
Title
Makes County Option Hospital Fee Pilot Program permanent and expands definition of "participating county" under program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A4091 (1R) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4091 (Same As) 2022-07-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.61.