NJ S2728 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A4210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $15,294,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to DEP for State acquisition of lands for recreation and conservation purposes, including Blue Acres projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $15,294,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to DEP for State acquisition of lands for recreation and conservation purposes, including Blue Acres projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateSubstituted by A4210
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4210 (Same As) 2018-08-10 - Approved P.L.2018, c.86.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback