NJ S2716 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A1796

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.213.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires NJ FamilyCare to reimburse claims for covered services submitted by clinical social workers, professional counselors, and marriage and family therapists under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires NJ FamilyCare to reimburse claims for covered services submitted by clinical social workers, professional counselors, and marriage and family therapists under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4153 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-30 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateApproved P.L.2023, c.213.
2023-12-21SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2023-12-21SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2023-12-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
2023-12-21AssemblySubstituted for A4153 (1R)
2023-12-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2023-12-11AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
2023-12-11SenatePassed by the Senate (34-0)
2023-11-30SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-05-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2716 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.213.
A4153 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Substituted by S2716 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback