NJ S2701 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1595
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4138 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4138 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to develop public emergency response plan for licensed providers of services to individuals with developmental disabilities.
Title
Requires Department of Human Services to develop public emergency response plan for licensed providers of services to individuals with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted by A4138 (1R) |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2701 (Carry Over) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A4138 (1R)
A4138 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.292.
A4138 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.292.