NJ S2698 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4263
Note: Carry Over of previous S2819
Note: Carry Over of previous S2819
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Protects financial institutions and insurers doing business with cannabis industry from being penalized by State regulators.
Title
Protects financial institutions and insurers doing business with cannabis industry from being penalized by State regulators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A901 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A4263 (Carry Over) 2022-12-05 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S2819 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4263 (Carry Over) 2022-12-05 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S2819 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2698 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2698_I1.HTM |