NJ S2691 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes supplemental appropriation of $100,000 to Commission on Human Trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes supplemental appropriation of $100,000 to Commission on Human Trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4218 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A4218 (1R)
2019-06-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-16AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-11-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4218 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2691 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback