NJ S2684 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that former law enforcement officers and firefighters who retired due to disability are eligible to receive tuition assistance to attend public institution of higher education or proprietary institution licensed to confer academic degrees. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that former law enforcement officers and firefighters who retired due to disability are eligible to receive tuition assistance to attend public institution of higher education or proprietary institution licensed to confer academic degrees. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-06SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2137 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback