NJ S2682 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A542

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A312 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain health care facilities to provide information concerning palliative care and hospice care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain health care facilities to provide information concerning palliative care and hospice care services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted by A312 (2R)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A312 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.227.
A542 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback