NJ S2679 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5232
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A2442 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A2442 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes reciprocity requirements for out-of-State certified nurse aides to practice in New Jersey. *
Title
Establishes reciprocity requirements for out-of-State certified nurse aides to practice in New Jersey. *
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A2442 (1R) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (35-0) (Singer) |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2442 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.18.
A5232 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A5232 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee