NJ S2674 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.83.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revises standard for warrantless seizure of animal at risk due to violation of law concerning necessary care and tethering of animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises standard for warrantless seizure of animal at risk due to violation of law concerning necessary care and tethering of animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4157 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.83.
2019-03-14SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
2019-03-04SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-02-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-1)
2019-02-25AssemblySubstituted for A4157 (1R)
2018-12-17AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-11-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-10-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4157 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S2674 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback