NJ S2670 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5938
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A637
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A637
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises permit and license processes for sports pools operators and online sports pool operators; revises definitions of certain sports events; allows for transactional waiver for sports wagering lounge.
Title
Revises permit and license processes for sports pools operators and online sports pool operators; revises definitions of certain sports events; allows for transactional waiver for sports wagering lounge.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted by A637 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A637 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.286.
A5938 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A5938 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee