NJ S2665 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.8.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits use of misleading website to sell event tickets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits use of misleading website to sell event tickets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4081 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.8.
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0)
2018-12-17AssemblySubstituted for A4081
2018-10-15AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
2018-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4081 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2665

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback