NJ S2657 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A4207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A4207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Medicaid emergency room triage reimbursement fee for low acuity emergency room encounters.
Title
Establishes Medicaid emergency room triage reimbursement fee for low acuity emergency room encounters.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Substituted by A4207 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4207 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.51.