NJ S2656 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.284.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.284.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes 35 member New Jersey Puerto Rico Commission in Department of State.
Title
Establishes 35 member New Jersey Puerto Rico Commission in Department of State.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4188 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.284. |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-1-0) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4188 |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4188 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S2656