NJ S2642 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A3974 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A3974 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits extradition of individual from another state back to that state for actions related to conduct concerning reproductive health care services lawful in this State.
Title
Prohibits extradition of individual from another state back to that state for actions related to conduct concerning reproductive health care services lawful in this State.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A3974 (1R) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3974 (Same As) 2022-07-01 - Approved P.L.2022, c.50.