NJ S2635 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4681
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A1906/4230 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A1906/4230 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes false incrimination and filing false police report as form of bias intimidation; establishes crime of false 9-1-1 call with purpose to intimidate or harass based on race or other protected class.
Title
Includes false incrimination and filing false police report as form of bias intimidation; establishes crime of false 9-1-1 call with purpose to intimidate or harass based on race or other protected class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | Substituted by A1906/4230 (ACS) |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1906 (Same As) 2020-08-31 - Approved P.L.2020, c.73.
A4681 (Carry Over) 2018-10-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4230 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - Combined with A1906 (ACS)
A4681 (Carry Over) 2018-10-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4230 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - Combined with A1906 (ACS)