NJ S2626 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-26 - Substituted by A1491 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-26 - Substituted by A1491 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes certain bail restrictions on persons charged with violating domestic violence restraining orders.
Title
Imposes certain bail restrictions on persons charged with violating domestic violence restraining orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-26 | Substituted by A1491 (1R) | |
2011-09-19 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1491 (Same As) 2011-11-07 - Approved P.L.2011, c.138.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S2626 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S3000/2626_I1.HTM |