NJ S2618 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A2401 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes issuance of Delta Sigma Theta license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes issuance of Delta Sigma Theta license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSubstituted by A2401 (1R)
2018-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-05-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2401 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.109.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback