NJ S2617 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S767
Note: Carry Foward to future A3829
Note: Carry Foward to future A3829
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to establish communication campaign to encourage students to enroll in 30 credits per year and institutions to report to secretary on strategies and incentives to accomplish this goal.*
Title
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to establish communication campaign to encourage students to enroll in 30 credits per year and institutions to report to secretary on strategies and incentives to accomplish this goal.*
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2617 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2617 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4686 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2617 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4686 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee