NJ S2600 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2349
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3267 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3267 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes fee on single-use carryout bags used in certain stores and dedicates fee revenue to "Healthy Schools and Community Lead Abatement Fund."
Title
Establishes fee on single-use carryout bags used in certain stores and dedicates fee revenue to "Healthy Schools and Community Lead Abatement Fund."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Substituted by A3267 (1R) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3267 (Same As) 2018-08-27 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S2349 (Carry Over) 2016-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2349 (Carry Over) 2016-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee