NJ S2594 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3258
Note: Carry Over of previous A4605
Note: Carry Over of previous A4605
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2025 - 75% progression
Action: 2025-03-24 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2025 - 75% progression
Action: 2025-03-24 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $28,670,924 in 2003 and 1992 bond act monies for loans for dam restoration and repair projects and inland waters projects.
Title
Appropriates $28,670,924 in 2003 and 1992 bond act monies for loans for dam restoration and repair projects and inland waters projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2025-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3951 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3951 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-03-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2025-03-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A3951 (ACS) |
2025-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2025-03-20 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2025-03-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3258 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4605 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A3951 (Same As) 2025-03-24 - Substituted by S2594 (2R)
A4605 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A3951 (Same As) 2025-03-24 - Substituted by S2594 (2R)