NJ S2594 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides State aid to counties and municipalities to fund transportation services for veterans to VA facilities; appropriates $500,000. *
Title
Provides State aid to counties and municipalities to fund transportation services for veterans to VA facilities; appropriates $500,000. *
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-10 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-10 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4147 (Same As) 2016-09-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee