NJ S2591 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S763
Note: Carry Foward to future A819
Note: Carry Foward to future A819
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4372 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4372 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for resentencing of certain inmates.
Title
Provides for resentencing of certain inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted by A4372 (3R) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment (22-0) (Pou) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2591 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4372 (3R)
S2591 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4372 (3R)
A4372 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted for S2591 (2R)
S2591 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4372 (3R)
A4372 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted for S2591 (2R)