NJ S2590 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriation of $1.5 million to provide tuition assistance for students enrolled at Thomas Edison State University.
Title
Makes supplemental appropriation of $1.5 million to provide tuition assistance for students enrolled at Thomas Edison State University.
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Sen. James Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3862 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee