NJ S2584 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.104.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Makes changes to membership and responsibilities of Campus Sexual Assault Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes changes to membership and responsibilities of Campus Sexual Assault Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3622 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-19SenateApproved P.L.2020, c.104.
2020-08-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
2020-08-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-08-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2020-08-27AssemblySubstituted for A3622 (2R)
2020-08-27AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Quijano)
2020-08-27AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-08-27SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-06-25SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-06-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3622 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S2584 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback