NJ S2581 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A4163 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A4163 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipality with population over 200,000 to impose employer payroll tax; requires employer payroll tax revenues to be paid to school district in certain circumstances. *
Title
Allows municipality with population over 200,000 to impose employer payroll tax; requires employer payroll tax revenues to be paid to school district in certain circumstances. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A4163 (1R) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Cunningham) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Cunningham) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4163 (Same As) 2018-07-24 - Approved P.L.2018, c.68.