NJ S2578 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.198.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revises New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students Loan Program to require applicants first exhaust federal student loans, require income verification, and limit total student loan amounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students Loan Program to require applicants first exhaust federal student loans, require income verification, and limit total student loan amounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4239 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.198.
2017-06-26SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2017-06-12SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-06-08AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2017-06-08AssemblySubstituted for A4239 (1R)
2017-01-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-10-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2016-10-20SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2016-10-20SenateEmergency Resolution (36-0) (Cunningham)
2016-10-20SenateSenate Amendment (33-0) (Singer)
2016-10-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-09-29SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-09-29SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-09-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4239 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - Substituted by S2578 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback