NJ S2576 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5677
Note: Carry Over of previous S4063
Note: Carry Over of previous S4063
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes grant program in Department of State for preservation of certain Revolutionary War sites; appropriates funds.
Title
Establishes grant program in Department of State for preservation of certain Revolutionary War sites; appropriates funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1298 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A5677 (Carry Over) 2023-06-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S4063 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A5677 (Carry Over) 2023-06-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S4063 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2576 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2576_I1.HTM |