NJ S2573 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-12-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Higher Education Student Assistance Authority to establish income-driven repayment option and loan rehabilitation program for borrowers under New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Higher Education Student Assistance Authority to establish income-driven repayment option and loan rehabilitation program for borrowers under New Jersey College Loans to Assist State Students (NJCLASS) Loan Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-15AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-10-27AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-10-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2016-10-20SenatePassed by the Senate (29-3)
2016-10-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-09-29SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-09-29SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-09-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4084 (Same As) 2016-12-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback