NJ S2573 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2014 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3982
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires holder of casino license to provide certain employees with certain health care and retirement benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires holder of casino license to provide certain employees with certain health care and retirement benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-25SenateSubstituted by A3982
2014-12-08SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-12-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3982 (Same As) 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback