NJ S2567 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4088 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4088 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "High School to College Readiness Commission" to examine issues and develop recommendations to enhance student preparation for postsecondary education.
Title
Establishes "High School to College Readiness Commission" to examine issues and develop recommendations to enhance student preparation for postsecondary education.
Sponsors
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Substituted by A4088 (2R) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4088 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.170.