NJ S2567 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.99.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.99.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates "Fishing Buddy License."
Title
Creates "Fishing Buddy License."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4025 As (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4025 As (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4025 As (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.99. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4025 (AS) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (35-0) (Smith) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4025 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by S2567 (SCS)