NJ S2553 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1483
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides in-State tuition status to certain veterans and family members who attend public institutions of higher education during period of mandatory remote instruction due to public health emergencies.
Title
Provides in-State tuition status to certain veterans and family members who attend public institutions of higher education during period of mandatory remote instruction due to public health emergencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2553 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A4973 (Same As) 2020-11-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A4973 (Same As) 2020-11-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee