NJ S2544 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S337
Note: Carry Over of previous A2126
Note: Carry Over of previous A2126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (25-10)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (25-10)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands financing opportunities for low and moderate income housing.
Title
Expands financing opportunities for low and moderate income housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-10) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2544 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (25-10)
A1050 (Same As) 2020-10-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2126 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A1050 (Same As) 2020-10-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2126 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee