NJ S2538 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.63.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.63.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Office of Emergency Management to establish county storm preparedness funding program.*
Title
Requires Office of Emergency Management to establish county storm preparedness funding program.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4204 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.63. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A4204 (1R) |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment (28-0) (Sweeney) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4204 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2538 (2R)