NJ S2533 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Office of Victim-Witness Advocacy to provide services to certain inmates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Office of Victim-Witness Advocacy to provide services to certain inmates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-05-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4091 (Same As) 2018-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback