NJ S2531 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.163.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.163.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows county governing body in certain counties to abolish offices of superintendent and deputy superintendent of elections and transfer functions to county board of elections. *
Title
Allows county governing body in certain counties to abolish offices of superintendent and deputy superintendent of elections and transfer functions to county board of elections. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Emergency Resolution Vote (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4072 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Emergency Resolution Vote (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4072 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.163. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Motion Suspend 22:5a (Jones) (77-0-0) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (37-0) (Beach) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-0) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4072 (1R) |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-1) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4072 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2531 (2R)