NJ S253 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3173

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A841
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for establishment of county college certificate programs to meet needs of certain regional employers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for establishment of county college certificate programs to meet needs of certain regional employers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateSubstituted by A841
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3173 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A841 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.228.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback