NJ S2525 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.207.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.207.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Adjutant General to enter into agreements with legal services organizations to provide legal services to homeless veterans and veterans at risk of homelessness.
Title
Directs Adjutant General to enter into agreements with legal services organizations to provide legal services to homeless veterans and veterans at risk of homelessness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4022 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.207. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A4022 |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4022 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2525