NJ S2522 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain entertainment and retail activity during current public health emergency and state of emergency.
Title
Permits certain entertainment and retail activity during current public health emergency and state of emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4190 (Same As) 2020-06-18 - Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading